TN SB2912 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 846
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 846
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that TRA has no power in regard to standards for carbon dioxide transported via interstate pipeline that is subject to the federal Natural Gas Pipeline Safety Act.
Title
As enacted, specifies that TRA has no power in regard to standards for carbon dioxide transported via interstate pipeline that is subject to the federal Natural Gas Pipeline Safety Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Pub. Ch. 846 | |
2010-05-11 | Effective date(s) 04/30/10 | |
2010-04-30 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-04-20 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-04-19 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-04-19 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-04-16 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-04-14 | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0 | |
2010-04-14 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1149) | |
2010-04-14 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2010-04-05 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2010-04-01 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-04-01 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 30, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-30 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 04/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/1/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0997) | |
2010-03-23 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 03/25/2010 | |
2010-03-22 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 00 | |
2010-03-16 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/22/2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/23/2010 | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/09/2010 | |
2010-03-02 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/9/2010 | |
2010-02-25 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/02/2010 | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3046 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 846