TN HB2811 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes TDOT to allow volunteer groups to clean and assist in the maintenance of certain bridges on state highway system, in accordance with plans devised by the commissioner after consultation with the volunteers. - Amends TCA Title 54.
Title
As introduced, authorizes TDOT to allow volunteer groups to clean and assist in the maintenance of certain bridges on state highway system, in accordance with plans devised by the commissioner after consultation with the volunteers. - Amends TCA Title 54.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Government Operations Committee | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 03/03/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Action Def. in Government Operations Committee to 3/3/2010 | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 02/17/2010 | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee for review--Transportation | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-21 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2728 (Crossfiled) 2010-01-27 - P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2811&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2811.pdf |