TN HB2754 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Pub. Ch. 755
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Pub. Ch. 755
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies and reiterates current law concerning what duties may be performed by general contractors and architects and engineers performing construction management agent or advisor services for the construction of school buildings or additions to existing buildings. - Amends TCA Section 49-2-203.
Title
As enacted, clarifies and reiterates current law concerning what duties may be performed by general contractors and architects and engineers performing construction management agent or advisor services for the construction of school buildings or additions to existing buildings. - Amends TCA Section 49-2-203.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Pub. Ch. 755 | |
2010-04-20 | Effective date(s) 04/13/10 | |
2010-04-13 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-04-01 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2010-04-01 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-03-31 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-03-30 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2010-03-29 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-29 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2010-03-03 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2010-03-01 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-03-01 | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 1 | |
2010-02-25 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/1/2010 | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 02/25/2010 | |
2010-02-24 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 02/24/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Education Committee | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 02/17/2010 | |
2010-02-09 | Assigned to s/c K-12 of ED | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to Education Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-20 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3070 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 755
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2754&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2754.pdf |