TN HB2670 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 948
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 948
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides that any voluntary association that establishes and enforces bylaws or rules for interscholastic sports competition for secondary schools in this state is subject to an annual audit by the comptroller of the treasury; enacts other provisions regarding school athletics associations. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 3 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, provides that any voluntary association that establishes and enforces bylaws or rules for interscholastic sports competition for secondary schools in this state is subject to an annual audit by the comptroller of the treasury; enacts other provisions regarding school athletics associations. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 3 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 948 | |
2018-04-18 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Action def. in Education Administration & Planning to 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning-- Government Operations for Review |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2662 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 948