TN HB2667 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes the repeal date of December 31, 2022, for the privilege tax imposed on modern market telecommunications providers for the privilege of competing with public utilities to provide telecommunications services; revises related provisions concerning such tax. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5 and Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, deletes the repeal date of December 31, 2022, for the privilege tax imposed on modern market telecommunications providers for the privilege of competing with public utilities to provide telecommunications services; revises related provisions concerning such tax. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5 and Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Withdrawn. |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2853 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-20 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2667&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/HB2667.pdf |