TN HB2667 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the office of research and education accountability (OREA) to investigate and report on unauthorized grade changes occurring at public schools and public charter schools in Shelby County no later than December 31, 2018. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires the office of research and education accountability (OREA) to investigate and report on unauthorized grade changes occurring at public schools and public charter schools in Shelby County no later than December 31, 2018. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3 and Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2406 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee