TN HB2667 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - Action Def. in Transportation Committee to Omnibus Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - Action Def. in Transportation Committee to Omnibus Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes issuance of special license plates for submarine veterans of the U.S. armed forces. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, authorizes issuance of special license plates for submarine veterans of the U.S. armed forces. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Carr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-23 | Action Def. in Transportation Committee to Omnibus Bill | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 02/23/2010 | |
2010-02-16 | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on s/c cal Public Safety of TR for 02/16/2010 | |
2010-02-09 | Action Def. in s/c Public Safety of TR to 2/16/2010 | |
2010-02-03 | Placed on s/c cal Public Safety of TR for 02/09/2010 | |
2010-01-27 | Assigned to s/c Public Safety of TR | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-19 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2582 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2667&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2667.pdf |