TN HB2613 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 965
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, prohibits public and private employers from requiring an employee or prospective employee to execute a non-disclosure agreement with respect to sexual harassment in the workplace as a condition of employment. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 1, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, prohibits public and private employers from requiring an employee or prospective employee to execute a non-disclosure agreement with respect to sexual harassment in the workplace as a condition of employment. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 1, Part 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18 Pub. Ch. 965
2018-05-18 Effective date(s) 05/15/2018
2018-05-15 Signed by Governor.
2018-05-07HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2018-05-01SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-25HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-04-25HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2018-04-23SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2018-04-23SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0854)
2018-04-23SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2018-03-26SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2018-03-22HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2018-03-22HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-22HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
2018-03-22HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0845)
2018-03-15HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/22/2018
2018-03-14HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/15/2018
2018-03-14HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-03-07HousePlaced on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 3/14/2018
2018-03-07HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
2018-02-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
2018-02-28HouseAction Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 3/7/2018
2018-02-21HousePlaced on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 2/28/2018
2018-02-21HouseAction Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 2/28/2018
2018-02-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 2/21/2018
2018-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
2018-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
2018-02-05HouseP1C.
2018-02-01HouseFiled for intro.
2018-02-01HouseIntro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2328 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 965

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback