TN SB2328 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 965
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, prohibits public and private employers from requiring an employee or prospective employee to execute a non-disclosure agreement with respect to sexual harassment in the workplace as a condition of employment. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 1, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, prohibits public and private employers from requiring an employee or prospective employee to execute a non-disclosure agreement with respect to sexual harassment in the workplace as a condition of employment. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 1, Part 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 965
2018-04-24SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-23SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/23/2018
2018-04-19SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/23/2018
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/19/2018
2018-04-18SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/19/2018
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/18/2018
2018-04-17SenateSenate Reset on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/18/18
2018-04-13SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/17/2018
2018-03-20SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/20/2018
2018-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-02-01SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2613 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 965

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback