TN HB2573 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c HHR Subcommittee of Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c HHR Subcommittee of Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits the commissioner of health or certain licensing boards to suspend on an emergency basis the license of a practitioner who is under any state or federal indictment involving controlled substances. - Amends TCA Title 63.
Title
As introduced, permits the commissioner of health or certain licensing boards to suspend on an emergency basis the license of a practitioner who is under any state or federal indictment involving controlled substances. - Amends TCA Title 63.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Dunn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c HHR Subcommittee of Health & Human Resources Committee | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on s/c cal HHR Subcommittee for 3/20/2012 | |
2012-03-13 | Action Def. in s/c HHR Subcommittee to 3/20/2012 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on s/c cal HHR Subcommittee for 3/13/2012 | |
2012-03-06 | Action Def. in s/c HHR Subcommittee to 3/13/2012 | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on s/c cal HHR Subcommittee for 3/6/2012 | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to s/c HHR Subcommittee | |
2012-01-18 | P2C, ref. to Health & Human Resources Committee--Government Operations for review | |
2012-01-13 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2419 (Crossfiled) 2012-01-18 - P2C, ref. to S. H&W Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2573&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB2573.pdf |