TN HB2342 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 532
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 532
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends provisions regarding employee compensation and indemnification for officers killed in the line of duty to police officers employed by the state. - Amends TCA Section 7-51-208(a)(2).
Title
As enacted, extends provisions regarding employee compensation and indemnification for officers killed in the line of duty to police officers employed by the state. - Amends TCA Section 7-51-208(a)(2).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-07 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-31 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-31 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 532 | |
2012-02-13 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2012-02-07 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/13/2012 | |
2012-02-02 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/7/2012 | |
2012-01-31 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-01-25 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 1/31/2012 | |
2012-01-13 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2012-01-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2204 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-02 - Pub. Ch. 532