TN HB2297 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands home improvement contractor licensing and other requirements to the entire state; clarifies the terms owner, contractor, and commissioner; removes certain exemptions in the home improvement contractor law. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 6, Part 5.
Title
As introduced, expands home improvement contractor licensing and other requirements to the entire state; clarifies the terms owner, contractor, and commissioner; removes certain exemptions in the home improvement contractor law. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 6, Part 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-11 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/11/2014 |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2014-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-03 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2051 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-18 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C&L Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2297&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB2297.pdf |