TN HB2164 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-23 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-23 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, directs the commissioner of revenue to reduce the state sales tax rate on food if there is a surplus of state revenue collected above budgeted estimates in a fiscal year; reserves one-half of such surplus for additional Tennessee student assistance awards. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, directs the commissioner of revenue to reduce the state sales tax rate on food if there is a surplus of state revenue collected above budgeted estimates in a fiscal year; reserves one-half of such surplus for additional Tennessee student assistance awards. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-23 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-04-20 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 4/23/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to Tax Calendar | |
2012-03-28 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 4/4/2012 | |
2012-03-28 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 4/4/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 3/28/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2012-03-14 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/14/2012 | |
2012-01-24 | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee for review--Finance | |
2012-01-10 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-07-21 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3666 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-18 - Failed in S. F,W&M Comm.