TN HB2146 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-6)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Effective date(s) 05/04/2022, 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-6)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Effective date(s) 05/04/2022, 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes a third-party skills testing program administered by the department of safety for the purpose of facilitating the testing and licensure of commercial drivers; authorizes the department of correction to create a commercial driver license training program for purposes of training offenders who, upon release from incarceration, may be suitable for careers in the transportation industry. - Amends TCA Section 12-2-403; Title 41; Section 49-6-2107 and Title 55.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 12-2-403; Title 41; Section 49-6-2107 and Title 55, relative to commercial driver licenses.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Pat Marsh [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] |
Rep. Sam McKenzie [D] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Lowell Russell [R] |
Rep. Dave Wright [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. John Windle [D] | Rep. Rush Bricken [R] |
Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] | Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] |
Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Ron Travis [R] | Rep. Tim Hicks [R] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] |
Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] | Rep. Dale Carr [R] | Rep. Larry Miller [D] |
Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Effective date(s) 05/04/2022, 07/01/2022 | |
2022-05-09 | Pub. Ch. 992 | |
2022-05-04 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-04-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-20 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-19 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-18 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 94, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB2146 |
2022-04-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-14 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar 4/18/22 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0608) |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-04-07 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2022-04-07 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0603) |
2022-04-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-31 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/7/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/14/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2399 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 992