TN SB2399 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 992
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 992
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes a third-party skills testing program administered by the department of safety for the purpose of facilitating the testing and licensure of commercial drivers; authorizes the department of correction to create a commercial driver license training program for purposes of training offenders who, upon release from incarceration, may be suitable for careers in the transportation industry. - Amends TCA Section 12-2-403; Title 41; Section 49-6-2107 and Title 55.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 12-2-403; Title 41; Section 49-6-2107 and Title 55, relative to commercial driver licenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 992 | |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/6/2022 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/12/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2146 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-09 - Effective date(s) 05/04/2022, 07/01/2022