TN HB2094 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-15 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c K-12 of ED of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-15 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c K-12 of ED of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes requirement that students pass comprehensive assessment program tests prior to graduating from high school; requires students to successfully complete all grade 12 requirements instead. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6 and Section 55-50-322.
Title
As introduced, deletes requirement that students pass comprehensive assessment program tests prior to graduating from high school; requires students to successfully complete all grade 12 requirements instead. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6 and Section 55-50-322.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-15 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c K-12 of ED of Education Committee | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Action Def. in s/c K-12 of ED to 4/15/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 04/08/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Action Def. in s/c K-12 of ED to 4/8/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 04/01/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Action Def. in s/c K-12 of ED to 4/1/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 03/25/2009 | |
2009-03-10 | Assigned to s/c K-12 of ED | |
2009-03-04 | P2C, ref. to Education | |
2009-03-02 | P1C. | |
2009-02-26 | Intro. | |
2009-02-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1488 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-22 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2094&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2094.pdf |