TN HB2038 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 351
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 351
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that beginning with the 2011-2012 school year, a student in the third grade may not be promoted to the next grade level unless the student has shown a basic understanding of curriculum and ability to perform the skills required in the subject of reading as demonstrated by the student's grades or standardized test results; such student may be promoted if the student participates in an LEA approved research-based intervention prior to the beginning of the next school year; act does not apply to any student who has an IEP pursuant to the federal Individuals with Disabilities Education Act. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, specifies that beginning with the 2011-2012 school year, a student in the third grade may not be promoted to the next grade level unless the student has shown a basic understanding of curriculum and ability to perform the skills required in the subject of reading as demonstrated by the student's grades or standardized test results; such student may be promoted if the student participates in an LEA approved research-based intervention prior to the beginning of the next school year; act does not apply to any student who has an IEP pursuant to the federal Individuals with Disabilities Education Act. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-10 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-10 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 351 | |
2011-05-19 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2011-05-12 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/12/2011 | |
2011-05-10 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-05-10 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/10/2011 | |
2011-05-10 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 5/11/2011 | |
2011-05-03 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2011-05-03 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 5/3/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Education Committee | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 4/27/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 4/27/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 4/20/2011 | |
2011-03-01 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Education | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to Education Committee | |
2011-02-23 | P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1776 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 351