TN HB1932 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 727
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 727
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands the applicability of the Neighborhood Preservation Act to certain occupied buildings and residential properties by authorizing a person to bring a civil action against the owner of an occupied building or property that is not properly maintained or that fails to comply with certain ordinances or regulations. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, expands the applicability of the Neighborhood Preservation Act to certain occupied buildings and residential properties by authorizing a person to bring a civil action against the owner of an occupied building or property that is not properly maintained or that fails to comply with certain ordinances or regulations. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Jim Coley [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Pub. Ch. 727 | |
2016-04-26 | Effective date(s) 04/07/2016 | |
2016-04-07 | Signed by Governor. | |
2016-03-29 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-03-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-03-22 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 20, Nays 7 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-02-25 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-02-25 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2016-02-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/25/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/18/2016 |
2016-02-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/16/2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/10/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-20 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2300 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 727