TN SB2300 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 727
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 727
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands the applicability of the Neighborhood Preservation Act to certain occupied buildings and residential properties by authorizing a person to bring a civil action against the owner of an occupied building or property that is not properly maintained or that fails to comply with certain ordinances or regulations. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, expands the applicability of the Neighborhood Preservation Act to certain occupied buildings and residential properties by authorizing a person to bring a civil action against the owner of an occupied building or property that is not properly maintained or that fails to comply with certain ordinances or regulations. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Sen. James Kyle [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-16 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 727 | |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/21/2016 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/21/2016 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/16/2016 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/2/2016 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/2/2016 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/24/2016 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 2/24/2016 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/22/2016 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/16/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1932 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 727