TN HB1679 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, permits a person to have the person's criminal records expunged if the person has been convicted of one or more criminal offenses other than the offense for which the person is seeking expunction; clarifies that a person is only eligible for expunction of criminal records once; requires that the person not have been convicted of a criminal offense that is ineligible for expunction, including federal offenses and offenses in other states, that occurred prior to the offense for which the person is seeking expunction. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 32.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, Chapter 32, relative to expunction of criminal records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2022 | |
2022-03-30 | Pub. Ch. 677 | |
2022-03-28 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-03-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-03-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-16 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0504) |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-10 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-03-10 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-10 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0503) |
2022-03-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/10/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/3/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/9/2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/2/2022 |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1781 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-20 - Sponsor(s) Added.