TN SB1781 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, permits a person to have the person's criminal records expunged if the person has been convicted of one or more criminal offenses other than the offense for which the person is seeking expunction; clarifies that a person is only eligible for expunction of criminal records once; requires that the person not have been convicted of a criminal offense that is ineligible for expunction, including federal offenses and offenses in other states, that occurred prior to the offense for which the person is seeking expunction. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 32.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, Chapter 32, relative to expunction of criminal records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-30 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 677 | |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/14/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/22/2022 |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1679 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-30 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022