TN HB1661 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-25 - Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-25 - Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Restricted Access by Minors to Obscene Library Materials Act." - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 1 and Title 10, Chapter 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 10, Chapter 1 and Title 10, Chapter 3, relative to accessing or viewing obscene library materials by minors.
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Jody Barrett [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-18 | House | Action def. in Government Operations Committee to 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/18/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/7/2024 |
2024-01-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee - Government Operations for Review |
2024-01-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2173 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-06 - Deferred to Summer Study