TN HB1653 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, upon written request by a member of the general assembly, requires all state and local law enforcement agencies to release to the member making the request a copy of all records collected by the agency, including, but not limited to, all writings and medical, toxicology, and other reports, of a perpetrator involved in a school shooting incident that occurred at a public or private school in this state in March of 2023. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5 and Title 38.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5 and Title 38, relative to law enforcement.
Sponsors
Rep. Gino Bulso [R] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2024-01-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2835 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee