TN SB2835 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, upon written request by a member of the general assembly, requires all state and local law enforcement agencies to release to the member making the request a copy of all records collected by the agency, including, but not limited to, all writings and medical, toxicology, and other reports, of a perpetrator involved in a school shooting incident that occurred at a public or private school in this state in March of 2023. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5 and Title 38.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5 and Title 38, relative to law enforcement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1653 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-28 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.