TN HB1558 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 980
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 980
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates an exemption for Anderson County to the requirement for an affirmative vote by a majority of the membership of a school board in order to disburse funds from the LEA's dedicated education fund. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, creates an exemption for Anderson County to the requirement for an affirmative vote by a majority of the membership of a school board in order to disburse funds from the LEA's dedicated education fund. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 6 BY Swann PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 65 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 6 BY Swann PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 35 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 3 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 6 BY Swann PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 65 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 6 BY Swann PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 35 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 3 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 980 |
2014-04-17 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-04-17 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted. |
2014-04-17 | House | Motion to lift from table the motion to reconsider actions adopted. |
2014-04-16 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0 |
2014-04-15 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA1215) |
2014-04-15 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 4 - HA1278) |
2014-04-15 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 5 - HA1283) |
2014-04-15 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 6 - HA1291) |
2014-04-15 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 6 of 0 - HA1291), Ayes 65, Nays 25 |
2014-04-15 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 5 of 0 - HA1283) |
2014-04-15 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 4 of 0 - HA1278) |
2014-04-15 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 3 of 0 - HA1277) |
2014-04-15 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA1215) |
2014-04-15 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1154) |
2014-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 3 for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-04-02 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-04-01 | House | Action Def. in Education Committee to 4/8/2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-25 | House | Action Def. in Education Committee to 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-11 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/11/2014 |
2014-03-05 | House | Sponsor change. |
2014-01-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee |
2014-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-16 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1453 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 980