TN HB1522 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Pub. Ch. 562
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Pub. Ch. 562
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, moves the jurisdiction for issuance of orders to destroy dogs that attack humans from circuit court to general sessions court; removes authorization to give notice of a petition to destroy a dog that has attacked a human to the dog's owner via certified mail so that notice of all such petitions must be made by personal service on the dog's owner. - Amends TCA Title 44, Chapter 17.
Title
As enacted, moves the jurisdiction for issuance of orders to destroy dogs that attack humans from circuit court to general sessions court; removes authorization to give notice of a petition to destroy a dog that has attacked a human to the dog's owner via certified mail so that notice of all such petitions must be made by personal service on the dog's owner. - Amends TCA Title 44, Chapter 17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Civil Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Civil Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | Senate | Pub. Ch. 562 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Effective date(s) 07/01/2014 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 26, Nays 0 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. |
2014-03-03 | House | Rcvd. from H., P1C. |
2014-03-03 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-03-03 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 81, Nays 1 |
2014-03-03 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0689) |
2014-02-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/3/2014 |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/27/2014 |
2014-02-20 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/20/2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/19/2014 |
2014-02-12 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/12/2014 |
2014-02-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 2/12/2014 |
2014-01-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/5/2014 |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2014-01-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2014-01-16 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-15 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1689 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 562