TN HB1484 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 375
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 375
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes the requirement that the firefighter representative to the board of trustees of the Tennessee consolidated retirement system be from a list submitted by the Tennessee professional fire fighters association instead of submitted jointly by the professional organizations that represent firefighters in this state. - Amends TCA Section 8-34-302.
Title
As enacted, changes the requirement that the firefighter representative to the board of trustees of the Tennessee consolidated retirement system be from a list submitted by the Tennessee professional fire fighters association instead of submitted jointly by the professional organizations that represent firefighters in this state. - Amends TCA Section 8-34-302.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-17 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 375 | |
2009-05-28 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/28/2009 | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/27/2009 | |
2009-05-19 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 05/19/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/13/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 5/13/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 5/6/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 4/22/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-02-19 | P2C, ref. to Finance | |
2009-02-18 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0473 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-17 - Pub. Ch. 375
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1484&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1484.pdf |