TN HB1386 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-22 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Conservation Subcommittee of Conservation & Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-22 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Conservation Subcommittee of Conservation & Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes hunting wild hogs at all times in Overton County. - Amends TCA Section 70-4-116.
Title
As introduced, authorizes hunting wild hogs at all times in Overton County. - Amends TCA Section 70-4-116.
Sponsors
Rep. John Windle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Conservation Subcommittee of Conservation & Environment Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on s/c cal Conservation Subcommittee for 3/22/2011 | |
2011-03-01 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Conservation | |
2011-02-23 | P2C, ref. to Conservation & Environment Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1695 (Crossfiled) 2011-03-23 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. E,C&T Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1386&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB1386.pdf |