TN HB1358 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a local governmental entity with centralized purchasing authority to increase the threshold, from $25,000 to $50,000, over which public advertisement and sealed competitive bids are required; reduces the number of purchase orders, from three to two, that must be retained by a county after a purchase order or contract is issued or executed. - Amends TCA Section 5-14-111 and Section 12-3-1212.
Title
As introduced, authorizes a local governmental entity with centralized purchasing authority to increase the threshold, from $25,000 to $50,000, over which public advertisement and sealed competitive bids are required; reduces the number of purchase orders, from three to two, that must be retained by a county after a purchase order or contract is issued or executed. - Amends TCA Section 5-14-111 and Section 12-3-1212.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2019-03-05 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0048 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-25 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.