TN SB0048 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a local governmental entity with centralized purchasing authority to increase the threshold, from $25,000 to $50,000, over which public advertisement and sealed competitive bids are required; reduces the number of purchase orders, from three to two, that must be retained by a county after a purchase order or contract is issued or executed. - Amends TCA Section 5-14-111 and Section 12-3-1212.
Title
As introduced, authorizes a local governmental entity with centralized purchasing authority to increase the threshold, from $25,000 to $50,000, over which public advertisement and sealed competitive bids are required; reduces the number of purchase orders, from three to two, that must be retained by a county after a purchase order or contract is issued or executed. - Amends TCA Section 5-14-111 and Section 12-3-1212.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/21/2019 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/12/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. S&L Govt. Comm. 2-12-19 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1358 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-04 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Committee