TN HB1358 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-30 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-30 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, contingent upon revenue growth exceeding three percent in any fiscal year, reduces the Hall income tax, which is presently levied by the state, until it reaches zero percent; upon the state tax rate reaching zero percent, allows local governments to levy a like tax not to exceed 2.25 percent, if the ordinance or resolution levying the tax is approved within two years. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 2.
Title
As introduced, contingent upon revenue growth exceeding three percent in any fiscal year, reduces the Hall income tax, which is presently levied by the state, until it reaches zero percent; upon the state tax rate reaching zero percent, allows local governments to levy a like tax not to exceed 2.25 percent, if the ordinance or resolution levying the tax is approved within two years. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0839 (Crossfiled) 2016-02-23 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee with recommendation
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1358&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1358.pdf |