TN SB0839 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-23 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee with recommendation
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-23 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee with recommendation
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, contingent upon revenue growth exceeding three percent in any fiscal year, reduces the Hall income tax, which is presently levied by the state, until it reaches zero percent; upon the state tax rate reaching zero percent, allows local governments to levy a like tax not to exceed 2.25 percent, if the ordinance or resolution levying the tax is approved within two years. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 2.
Title
As introduced, contingent upon revenue growth exceeding three percent in any fiscal year, reduces the Hall income tax, which is presently levied by the state, until it reaches zero percent; upon the state tax rate reaching zero percent, allows local governments to levy a like tax not to exceed 2.25 percent, if the ordinance or resolution levying the tax is approved within two years. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-23 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee with recommendation |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 2/16/2016 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/17/2015 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Refer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1358 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-30 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0839&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB0839.pdf |