TN HB1335 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes the date by which the department must submit its annual report on the pilot program to improve parent-teacher engagement from July 31 to August 15. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Action def. in Education Administration to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2021-03-22 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration |
2021-03-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2021-03-09 | House | Ref. to Education Administration |
2021-03-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0879 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-07 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee