TN HB1225 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, from 10 days to 10 business days, the period of time after an LEA receives the audit report of the LEA's school funds that the LEA is required to deliver a copy of the report to the commissioner of education. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 3, relative to education funding.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Hicks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1177 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee