TN HB1026 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes owners of single family residences to sell scrap metal from HVAC units previously installed at such residences. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 9.
Title
As introduced, authorizes owners of single family residences to sell scrap metal from HVAC units previously installed at such residences. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 9.
Sponsors
Rep. Vince Dean [R] | Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/19/2013 |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2013-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2013-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-07 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0636 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-13 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C&L Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1026&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB1026.pdf |