TN HB1016 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases from $40 to $50 the minimum amount that the state will match to an employee's optional retirement plan. - Amends TCA Section 3-9-103; Title 8, Chapter 25; Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36 and Title 8, Chapter 37.
Title
AN ACT, to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 3-9-103; Title 8, Chapter 25; Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36 and Title 8, Chapter 37, relative to retirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2021 | |
2021-05-19 | Pub. Ch. 416 | |
2021-05-12 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-28 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-27 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. SA1 Ayes 91, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB1016 |
2021-04-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/27/21 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0350) |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-03-30 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-03-29 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-25 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/29/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/25/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0516 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 416