TN HB0960 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c TennCare Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c TennCare Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Medicaid Buy-in for Working People with Disabilities Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 56 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Medicaid Buy-in for Working People with Disabilities Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 56 and Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c TennCare Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0945 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee