TN HB0930 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds as an advisory enhancement factor to sentencing that defendant intentionally chose victim of crime based on gender identity or expression. - Amends TCA Section 40-35-114.
Title
As introduced, adds as an advisory enhancement factor to sentencing that defendant intentionally chose victim of crime based on gender identity or expression. - Amends TCA Section 40-35-114.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2013 |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2013-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-05 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0708 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-09 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0930&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB0930.pdf |