TN HB0908 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Def. to Summer Study in Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Def. to Summer Study in Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits a person who has been accused of child abuse or neglect or child sexual abuse to petition the court with jurisdiction over the allegations to order the department of children's services to identify the reporter for good cause shown; prohibits the department from accepting reports for which the reporter refuses to provide the reporter's name and contact information. - Amends TCA Title 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37, relative to reports of child abuse or neglect or child sexual abuse.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1014 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee