TN HB0849 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Grow Jobs Through Employee Ownership Act," to support the growth and expansion of employee-owned businesses. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 49 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 49 and Title 67, relative to the expansion of employee-owned businesses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HouseAssigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee
2021-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Education Administration
2021-02-10HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-09HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1415 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback