TN SB1415 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Grow Jobs Through Employee Ownership Act," to support the growth and expansion of employee-owned businesses. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 49 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 49 and Title 67, relative to the expansion of employee-owned businesses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
2021-03-25SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/31/2021
2021-02-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-11SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0849 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-24 - Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback