TN HB0785 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 969
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, adds provisions regarding regulation of non-motorized vessels; deletes provision that exempts renters of watercraft who have completed a safety orientation from the requirement that any person born after January 1, 1989, who operates any vessel must successfully complete a boating safety examination and receive a certificate from the Tennessee wildlife resources agency or be accompanied on the vessel by a person who was born on or before January 1, 1989, or is 18 years of age or older and is certified to operate a vessel. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 11, Chapter 3; Title 39; Title 47; Title 56; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69 and Title 70.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, adds provisions regarding regulation of non-motorized vessels; deletes provision that exempts renters of watercraft who have completed a safety orientation from the requirement that any person born after January 1, 1989, who operates any vessel must successfully complete a boating safety examination and receive a certificate from the Tennessee wildlife resources agency or be accompanied on the vessel by a person who was born on or before January 1, 1989, or is 18 years of age or older and is certified to operate a vessel. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 11, Chapter 3; Title 39; Title 47; Title 56; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69 and Title 70.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 969
2018-04-19HouseComp. SB subst.
2018-04-16HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar #2 for 4/17/2018
2018-04-16HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/16/2018
2018-04-12HouseTaken off notice for cal. in Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-04-11HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/12/2018
2018-04-10HouseAction def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 4/12/2018
2018-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2018
2018-04-09HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-04-04HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/9/2018
2018-04-03HouseAction def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to Next Calendar
2018-03-28HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/3/2018
2018-03-27HouseAction def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/3/2018
2018-03-21HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/27/2018
2018-03-21HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-03-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
2018-03-14HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/21/2018
2018-03-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
2018-03-07HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/14/2018
2018-03-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
2018-02-28HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to Study Subcommittee
2018-02-21HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/28/2018
2018-02-21HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 2/28/2018
2018-02-20HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/21/2018
2018-01-31HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-05-08HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-05-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017
2017-05-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017
2017-05-01HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2017-04-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Study Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means for 5/1/2017
2017-04-12HouseDef. to Study Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-04-05HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/12/2017
2017-04-05HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-03-29HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/5/2017
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2017-03-21HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-03-15HousePlaced on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/21/2017
2017-03-15HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2017-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/15/2017
2017-03-08HouseAction Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/15/2017
2017-03-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/8/2017
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
2017-02-13HouseP2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2017-02-09HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-02-08HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1335 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 969

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback