TN HB0675 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 326
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 326
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the human rights commission, June 30, 2013; requires the division of state audit to return to the human rights commission on November 1, 2011, to review actions taken by the commission to address the internal control issues raised in the fourth finding in the April 2011 performance audit report. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 21, Part 2 and Title 4, Chapter 29.
Title
As enacted, extends the human rights commission, June 30, 2013; requires the division of state audit to return to the human rights commission on November 1, 2011, to review actions taken by the commission to address the internal control issues raised in the fourth finding in the April 2011 performance audit report. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 21, Part 2 and Title 4, Chapter 29.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Cobb [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 326 | |
2011-05-18 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2011-05-12 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/12/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 5/4/2011 | |
2011-03-09 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Government Operations Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/9/2011 | |
2011-02-16 | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee | |
2011-02-14 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0203 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 326