TN SB0203 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 326
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 326
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the human rights commission, June 30, 2013; requires the division of state audit to return to the human rights commission on November 1, 2011, to review actions taken by the commission to address the internal control issues raised in the fourth finding in the April 2011 performance audit report. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 21, Part 2 and Title 4, Chapter 29.
Title
As enacted, extends the human rights commission, June 30, 2013; requires the division of state audit to return to the human rights commission on November 1, 2011, to review actions taken by the commission to address the internal control issues raised in the fourth finding in the April 2011 performance audit report. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 21, Part 2 and Title 4, Chapter 29.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Watson (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Watson (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | Pub. Ch. 326 | |
2011-06-03 | Effective date(s) 05/30/11 | |
2011-05-30 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-05-19 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2011-05-19 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-05-18 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-05-18 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2011-05-18 | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-18 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0415) | |
2011-05-18 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2011-05-05 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2011-05-04 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2011-05-04 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0, PNV 1 | |
2011-05-04 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0388) | |
2011-05-02 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/4/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2011-04-21 | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 4/27/2011 | |
2011-02-09 | P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0675 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 326