TN HB0633 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 148
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 148
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits an individual or entity from selling, offering for sale, or providing an air ambulance membership agreement to an individual who is enrolled in TennCare Medicaid; requires an individual or entity that provides an air ambulance membership agreement to an individual who subsequently enrolls in TennCare Medicaid to provide the enrollee with a pro-rated refund of consideration paid for the membership; adds other related prohibitions, requirements, and penalties. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18; Title 56 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 47, Chapter 18; Title 56 and Title 71, relative to air ambulance memberships.
Sponsors
Rep. Tandy Darby [R] | Rep. Michael Hale [R] | Rep. Lowell Russell [R] | Rep. John Crawford [R] |
Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] | Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Rep. Kirk Haston [R] |
Rep. Dan Howell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 148 | |
2023-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-23 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2023-03-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/23/2023 |
2023-03-20 | House | Reset on cal. for next available Regular Calendar |
2023-03-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-16 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/20/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/16/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-07 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/7/2023 |
2023-02-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee to 3/7/2023 |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 2/28/2023 |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0504 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023