TN HB0594 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Fair Distribution of State Sales Tax Act." - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 6, relative to allocation of state sales and use tax revenue.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0465 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-23 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Revenue Subcommittee