TN HB0594 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the "Uninsured Motorist Identification Database Program." - Amends TCA Title 55 and Title 56.
Title
As introduced, creates the "Uninsured Motorist Identification Database Program." - Amends TCA Title 55 and Title 56.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 2014 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/20/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 3/20/2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/13/2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 3/13/2013 |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/6/2013 |
2013-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2013-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2013-02-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0845 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-20 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. T&S Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0594&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB0594.pdf |