TN HB0538 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces from 60 days to 45 days, the time period following the end of each calendar year in which the commissioner must annually report to the governor. - Amends TCA Title 45.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 45, relative to financial institutions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1050 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee