TN HB0524 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows an LEA to petition for an administrative hearing on the merits of the commissioner of education's decision to withhold state funds from an LEA. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3.
Title
As introduced, allows an LEA to petition for an administrative hearing on the merits of the commissioner of education's decision to withhold state funds from an LEA. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee |
2017-03-23 | House | Ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2017-02-09 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0535 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee