TN SB0535 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows an LEA to petition for an administrative hearing on the merits of the commissioner of education's decision to withhold state funds from an LEA. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3.
Title
As introduced, allows an LEA to petition for an administrative hearing on the merits of the commissioner of education's decision to withhold state funds from an LEA. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/5/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0524 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-29 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs